House
|
04/30/2024
|
House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, April 19, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Engrossed on Saturday, April 6, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 75 Nay: 48
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Thompson, Senator Kloos and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proctor , Representative Waggoner and Representative Woodard as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Legislative Modernization
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 7, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Legislative Modernization
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|