Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 87 Nay: 38
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 82 Nay: 36
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 5, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|