House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|