Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House Introduced |