LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2685
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2685
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2685
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died on Calendar
House
03/12/2024
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
House
02/19/2024
House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
House
02/05/2024
House Referred to Committee on Taxation
House
02/05/2024
House Introduced