House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|