Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 84 Nay: 41
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Engrossed on Thursday, March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller, V. was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 80
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller, V.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sawyer Clayton was withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sawyer Clayton
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 78 Nay: 37
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Representative Hoheisel raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Oropeza
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Haswood was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Haswood
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|