Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Introduced |