LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2791
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2791
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2791
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died in Committee
House
02/29/2024
House Hearing: Thursday, February 29, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
House
02/14/2024
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
House
02/13/2024
House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
House
02/09/2024
House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
House
02/09/2024
House Introduced