Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 24 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Introduced |