House | 04/30/2024 | House Died on Calendar | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Blew was rejected | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Representative Tarwater raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Blew | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was adopted | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Introduced |