Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 116 Nay: 2 | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Introduced |