Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Introduced |