Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proctor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans and Military
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|