Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 42 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was adopted | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Introduced |