House
|
02/09/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Wednesday, February 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 80 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2023, 12:00 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2023, 12:00 PM Room 112 N
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|