LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB102
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB102
Overview
Activity Timeline
Authors & Sponsors
Committee Assignments
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
View All
Official Action Record
Meeting Schedule
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB102
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
02/15/2023
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Senate
01/26/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
Senate
01/25/2023
Senate Introduced