Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys, and Senator Pettey are appointed to replace Senator Petersen, Senator Kloos, and Senator Corson on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Helgerson are appointed to replace Representative Francis, Representative Neelly, and Representative Ballard on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Francis, Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Kloos and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 99 Nay: 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 2, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|