LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB110
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB110
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB110
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died on Calendar
Senate
03/26/2024
Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration failed to reach a 2/3 majority. Motion rejected. Yea: 19 Nay: 16
Senate
03/25/2024
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Senate
01/27/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Senate
01/26/2023
Senate Introduced