Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 3, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 101 Nay: 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|