House | 04/30/2024 | House Died on House Calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 2, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate Introduced |