House | 03/28/2024 | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Senate Introduced |