Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 86 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Tarwater, Representative Borjon and Representative Probst appointed as third conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Thompson, Senator Kloos and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as third conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Motion to reconsider previous action adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 19 Nay: 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Thompson, Senator Kloos and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Tarwater, Representative Borjon and Representative Probst appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Tarwater, Representative Borjon and Representative Probst appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Thompson , Senator Kloos and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 84 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 25 Nay: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|