Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 84 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|