Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 546-S | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Senate Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, December 19, 2022 |