LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB224
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB224
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB224
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
03/08/2023
Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Senate
03/07/2023
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Senate
02/10/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Senate
02/09/2023
Senate Introduced