Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 76 Nay: 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Wasinger, Representative Carpenter, B. and Representative Stogsdill appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Billinger , Senator Claeys and Senator Pettey as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 96 Nay: 26
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Legislative Modernization
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Legislative Modernization
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|