House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 82 Nay: 43
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 82 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Gossage , Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 80 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bryce was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bryce
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 8:30 AM Room Room Change to 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|