House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Died in House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fagg was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fagg
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted Yea: 20 Nay: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|