Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Thursday, April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 70 Nay: 52
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries and Representative Hoye appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson, and Senator Pettey are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|