Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Utilities; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Introduced |