Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Warren was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Warren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|