Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Water
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources; Referred to Committee on Water
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 34 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 5, 2024
|
|
|