Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|