Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, February 29, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 28, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S - CANCELED
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|