Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Thursday, May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 108 Nay: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Senator Tyson, Senator Peck, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Pittman on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp, and Representative Sawyer are appointed to replace Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford, and Representative Xu on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford and Representative Xu appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 85 Nay: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|