House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Died in House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|