House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 23 Nay: 17 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Blasi was adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Blasi | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Introduced |