House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senate Introduced |