Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 82 Nay: 41
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Billinger , Senator Claeys and Senator Pettey as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 103 Nay: 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller, V. was adopted Yea: 83 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Representative Waymaster challenged the amendment under the Pay-Go provision of House Rule 2110. The amendment was ruled to be in order.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller, V.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was adopted Yea: 75 Nay: 46
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Owens
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waymaster was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waymaster
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Blew was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Blew
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|