Senate | 04/01/2024 | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Introduced |