Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Delperdang, Representative Turner and Representative Ohaebosim appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Fagg , Senator Petersen and Senator Francisco as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 107 Nay: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|