LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB469
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB469
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB469
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
02/28/2024
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Education
Senate
02/23/2024
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Senate
02/19/2024
Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S - CANCELED
Senate
02/07/2024
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
Senate
02/06/2024
Senate Introduced