House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 87 Nay: 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Wednesday, April 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 23 Nay: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 82 Nay: 41
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|