LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB487
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB487
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB487
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died on Calendar
Senate
03/04/2024
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
Senate
02/20/2024
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
Senate
02/09/2024
Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities
Senate
02/08/2024
Senate Introduced