House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Introduced |