LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB494
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB494
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB494
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
03/20/2024
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Senate
02/09/2024
Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Senate
02/08/2024
Senate Introduced