Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Humphries was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Humphries
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|