House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Died in House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Straub was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Straub
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steffen was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Blasi was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Blasi
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Senator Longbine raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted Yea: 20 Nay: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holscher was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 14 Nay: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steffen was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Steffen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|