Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate Introduced |